PA HB1518 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 5, 1941 (P.L.84, No.45), entitled "An act providing for and regulating the appointment, promotion and reduction in rank, suspension and removal of paid members of the police force in boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class maintaining a police force of not less than three members; creating a civil service commission in each borough, incorporated town and township of the first class; defining the duties of such civil service commission; imposing certain duties and expense on boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class; imposing penalties, and repealing inconsistent laws," further providing for general provisions relating to examinations, for rejection of applicant and hearing, for manner of filling appointments, for probationary period, for promotions and for physical examinations.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 5, 1941 (P.L.84, No.45), entitled "An act providing for and regulating the appointment, promotion and reduction in rank, suspension and removal of paid members of the police force in boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class maintaining a police force of not less than three members; creating a civil service commission in each borough, incorporated town and township of the first class; defining the duties of such civil service commission; imposing certain duties and expense on boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class; imposing penalties, and repealing inconsistent laws," further providing for general provisions relating to examinations, for rejection of applicant and hearing, for manner of filling appointments, for probationary period, for promotions and for physical examinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Richard Grucela [D] |
Rep. David Kessler [D] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-10-05 - House - HB 1518 PN 4286, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1518 PN 4286, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1518 PN 2063, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1518 PN 4286, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1518 PN 2063, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-19 | Act No. 78 | |
2010-10-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-05 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-03-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-02-02 | First consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-07-15 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-14 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-08 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-16 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |