PA HB153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 2993
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 2993
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, reducing the size of the General Assembly.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, reducing the size of the General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, MOT OBJECT REPORT, CORR (Y: 76 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended with Prior Printer's Number 2993 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Revert to prior printer's number (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 153 PN 3689, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, FP (Y: 109 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 107 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, FP (Y: 101 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, KNOWLES (Y: 104 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5648, COX (Y: 85 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5646, COX (Y: 63 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A55, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 114 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5341, GERMANE, KNOWLES (Y: 84 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5358, FREEMAN (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05341 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended with Prior Printer's Number 2993 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Revert to prior printer's number (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 153 PN 3689, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, FP (Y: 109 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 107 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, FP (Y: 101 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 2993, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, KNOWLES (Y: 104 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5648, COX (Y: 85 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5646, COX (Y: 63 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A55, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 114 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5341, GERMANE, KNOWLES (Y: 84 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 153 PN 117, 2017 A5358, FREEMAN (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05341 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 2993 |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-21 | House | In the House |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-7) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Final passage (109-80) |
2018-03-13 | House | Vote on final passage reconsidered (107-82) |
2018-03-13 | House | Final passage (101-84) |
2018-03-12 | House | Third consideration |
2018-02-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-02-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-02-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-01-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |