PA HB1533 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1988 (P.L.556, No.101), known as the Municipal Waste Planning, Recycling and Waste Reduction Act, in recycling and waste reduction, further providing for municipal implementation of recycling programs.
Title
In recycling and waste reduction, further providing for municipal implementation of recycling programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Rader [R] | Rep. John McGinnis [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Melinda Fee [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1533 PN 2556, FP (Y: 118 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04014 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04014 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1533 PN 2556, FP (Y: 118 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04014 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04014 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2015-12-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (118-83) |
2015-12-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-07 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |