PA HB1542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations relating to liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for special occasion permits and for wine and spirits auction permits.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations relating to liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for special occasion permits and for wine and spirits auction permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2889, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1542 PN 2889, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2601, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2903, HEFFLEY (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2846, SOLOMON (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2889, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1542 PN 2889, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2601, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2903, HEFFLEY (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2846, SOLOMON (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | House | Act No. 116 |
2019-12-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-12-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-12-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Signed in House |
2019-12-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-21 | House | In the House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2019-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |