PA HB1547 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-03 - Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-03 - Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, providing for suspension for inspection deficiencies.
Title
In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, providing for suspension for inspection deficiencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-02 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2154, FP (Y: 191 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2154, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 183 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2008, 2017 A2214, DONATUCCI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01876 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01877 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2154, FP (Y: 191 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2154, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 183 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 2008, 2017 A2214, DONATUCCI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01876 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01877 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Senate | Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2160 |
2017-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-6) |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |