PA HB1558 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 3, 1933 (P.L.242, No.86), referred to as the Cosmetology Law, further providing for eligibility requirements for examination and for limited licenses; and providing for practice of massage therapy in cosmetology salon or esthetician salon.
Title
Further providing for eligibility requirements for examination and for limited licenses; and providing for practice of massage therapy in cosmetology salon or esthetician salon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1558 PN 2095, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1558 PN 2095, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Act No. 136 |
2014-09-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-09-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-09-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-09-22 | House | Signed in House |
2014-09-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0) |
2014-09-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-09-16 | House | In the House |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-20 | House | First consideration |
2013-11-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |