PA HB1559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, adding provisions relating to bidder registration before sale; and, in sale of property, further providing for date of sale, for repurchase by owner, for restrictions on purchases and for sale of property in repository.
Title
Adding provisions relating to bidder registration before sale; and, in sale of property, further providing for date of sale, for repurchase by owner, for restrictions on purchases and for sale of property in repository.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |