PA HB1567 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, clarifying the scope of the act; and further providing for definitions.
Title
Clarifying the scope of the act; and further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - HB 1567 PN 2069, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2706, SHAPIRO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2673, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2452, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2447, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - HB 1567 PN 2069, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2706, SHAPIRO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2673, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2452, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - HB 1567 PN 1929, 2011 A2447, DEPASQUALE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-14 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2011-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |