PA HB1567 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in theft and related offenses, defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Title
In theft and related offenses, defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1567 PN 2247, FP (Y: 194 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1567 PN 2247, FP (Y: 194 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-12-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-2) |
2015-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |