PA HB1589 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees, restrictions, for public venue license and for performing acts facility license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees, restrictions, for public venue license and for performing acts facility license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 2602, FP (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 2048, 2019 A2937, KENYATTA (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-25SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-10-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-3)
2019-10-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-09-24HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-19HouseReported as committed
2019-06-07HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1589
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1589&pn=2048
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1589&pn=2602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=09/19/2019&RollCallId=1042
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=712
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=1190

Bill Comments

feedback