PA HB1603 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for sex trafficking and missing and abducted children; in uniform interstate family support, making extensive revisions to general provisions, jurisdiction, civil provisions of general application, establishment of support order, direct enforcement of order of another state without registration, enforcement and modification of support order after registration, determination of parentage, interstate rendition and miscellaneous provisions and providing for support proceeding under convention; and, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions and for disposition of dependent children.
Title
Providing for sex trafficking and missing and abducted children; in uniform interstate family support, making extensive revisions to general provisions, jurisdiction, civil provisions of general application, establishment of support order, direct enforcement of order of another state without registration, enforcement and modification of support order after registration, determination of parentage, interstate rendition and miscellaneous provisions and providing for support proceeding under convention; and, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions and for disposition of dependent children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1603 PN 2651, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1603 PN 2651, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1603 PN 2544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1603 PN 2318, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1603 PN 2651, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1603 PN 2544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1603 PN 2318, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | House | Act No. 94 |
2015-12-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-14 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2015-12-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-12-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-12-10 | House | In the House |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Vote on third consideration and final passage reconsidered |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2015-10-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2015-10-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-26 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |