PA HB1617 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for collection by legal representatives of deceased tax collectors.
Title
Further providing for collection by legal representatives of deceased tax collectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - HB 1617 PN 2228, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - HB 1617 PN 2228, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-12-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-10-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-10-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-22 | House | Second consideration |
2013-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-02 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |