PA HB1630 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 28, 1947 (P.L.1110, No.476), known as the Motor Vehicle Sales Finance Act, further providing for revocation or suspension of licenses.
Title
Further providing for revocation or suspension of licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-23 - House - HB 1630 PN 2818, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - HB 1630 PN 2818, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-26 - House - HB 1630 PN 2079, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - HB 1630 PN 2818, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-26 - House - HB 1630 PN 2079, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | House | Act No. 5 |
2012-02-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-01-25 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-01-24 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-01-24 | House | Signed in House |
2012-01-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0) |
2012-01-23 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-01-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-01-17 | House | In the House |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-11-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2011-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2011-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-15 | House | Re-referred to COMMERCE |
2011-06-15 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to COMMERCE |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |