PA HB1640 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the display of the national motto "In God We Trust" and the Bill of Rights in classrooms and other areas in public school buildings.
Title
Providing for the display of the national motto "In God We Trust" and the Bill of Rights in classrooms and other areas in public school buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 3197, FP (Y: 179 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 2388, 2015 A6584, O'BRIEN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 2388, 2015 A6583, CARROLL (Y: 83 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06583 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 3197, FP (Y: 179 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 2388, 2015 A6584, O'BRIEN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1640 PN 2388, 2015 A6583, CARROLL (Y: 83 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06583 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-20) |
2016-05-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-19 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |