PA HB1644 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-21)
Status: Enrolled on October 24 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 60
Status: Enrolled on October 24 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 60
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 22/322 from the Mifflintown exit in Juniata County to the Juniata/Mifflin County line, as the Dr. L.G. Guiser Memorial Highway.
Title
An Act designating a portion of State Route 22/322 from the Mifflintown exit in Juniata County to the Juniata/Mifflin County line, as the Dr. L.G. Guiser Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-25 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-10-24 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-10-24 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-10-24 | Signed in House | |
2007-10-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-17 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-16 | First consideration | |
2007-10-16 | Reported as committed | |
2007-07-07 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-07-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-07-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-05 | Second consideration | |
2007-07-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-07-02 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-07-02 | First consideration | |
2007-07-02 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1644 |