PA HB1693 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, providing for notice of legal representation for medical assistance.
Title
In departmental powers and duties as to licensing, providing for notice of legal representation for medical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1693 PN 3460, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1693 PN 2712, 2021 A3703 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03626 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03611 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1693 PN 3460, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1693 PN 2712, 2021 A3703 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03626 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03611 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2022-09-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-09-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-02-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-07 | House | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to HEALTH |