PA HB1699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for operation of certain combinations on interstate and certain other highways, repealing provisions relating to operation of motor homes on interstate and certain other highways and further providing for width of vehicles and for length of vehicles; and, in administration and enforcement, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for operation of certain combinations on interstate and certain other highways, repealing provisions relating to operation of motor homes on interstate and certain other highways and further providing for width of vehicles and for length of vehicles; and, in administration and enforcement, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. James Marshall [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Thomas Sankey [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1699 PN 3125, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05690 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1699 PN 3125, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05690 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-08-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |