PA HB17 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the Pickertown Road Bridge carrying Pickertown Road over the U.S. Route 202 Parkway in Warrington Township, Bucks County, as the Robert V. Cotton Bridge.
Title
Designating the Pickertown Road Bridge carrying Pickertown Road over the U.S. Route 202 Parkway in Warrington Township, Bucks County, as the Robert V. Cotton Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - HB 17 PN 2466, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - HB 17 PN 2466, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - HB 17 PN 2466, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Senate | Act No. 89 |
2012-07-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-12-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-12-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2011-12-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-06 | House | Second consideration |
2011-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |