PA HB1706 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-2)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in intermediate units, further providing for loan of textbooks, instructional materials and instructional equipment, nonpublic school children.
Title
In intermediate units, further providing for loan of textbooks, instructional materials and instructional equipment, nonpublic school children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-02 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |