PA HB1711 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for Pennsylvania 1950s and 1960s heritage registration plates.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for Pennsylvania 1950s and 1960s heritage registration plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1711 PN 2584, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02857 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02772 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1711 PN 2584, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02857 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02772 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-02-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-22 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |