PA HB1772 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1772 PN 2821, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2821, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3608, MIHALEK (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3608, SUSP RULES, MIHALEK (Y: 192 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3375, PEIFER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03083 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2821, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3608, MIHALEK (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3608, SUSP RULES, MIHALEK (Y: 192 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1772 PN 2761, 2019 A3375, PEIFER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03083 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 103 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-11-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |