PA HB1806 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Department of Human Services for the purpose of medical assistance payments - critical access hospitals for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Title
Making an appropriation from the General Fund to the Department of Human Services for the purpose of medical assistance payments - critical access hospitals for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-10 | House | Second consideration |
2016-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |