PA HB1822 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, providing for nonresident pharmacies.
Title
Providing for nonresident pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |