PA HB1839 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-19)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act redesignating Duboistown Bridge, connecting Williamsport and Duboistown over the Susquehanna River, Lycoming County, as the Lance Corporal Abram Howard Memorial Bridge.
Title
Redesignating Duboistown Bridge, connecting Williamsport and Duboistown over the Susquehanna River, Lycoming County, as the Lance Corporal Abram Howard Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - HB 1839 PN 2356, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2012-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-04-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-04-03 | House | Second consideration |
2012-04-02 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-09-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |