PA HB1851 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and providing for sentences for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms..
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and providing for sentences for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02861 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02861 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |