PA HB1861 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Act No. 73 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Act No. 73 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in temporary regulatory flexibility authority, further providing for definitions and for temporary regulatory flexibility authority.
Title
In temporary regulatory flexibility authority, further providing for definitions and for temporary regulatory flexibility authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1861 PN 2200, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1861 PN 2200, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Re-Reported as Amended A02409 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1861 PN 2107, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1861 PN 2200, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1861 PN 2200, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Re-Reported as Amended A02409 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1861 PN 2107, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | House | Act No. 73 of 2021 |
2021-09-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-09-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-09-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Signed in House |
2021-09-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-09-29 | House | In the House |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-committed to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |