PA HB1874 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions and for classification of documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for classification of documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04732 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-18HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-18HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-06HouseReported as amended
2019-09-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback