PA HB1875 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for an optional sales and use tax for third class counties.
Title
Providing for an optional sales and use tax for third class counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-22 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-22 | First consideration | |
2009-07-22 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |