PA HB1877 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 72
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 72
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, further providing for authorization of hotel tax.
Title
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, further providing for authorization of hotel tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Buxton [D] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Rep. Ron Marsico [R] | Rep. John Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-18 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-12-13 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-12-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-12-13 | Signed in House | |
2007-12-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-12-11 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-10 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-10 | Second consideration | |
2007-12-05 | First consideration | |
2007-12-05 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-13 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2007-10-24 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-23 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-17 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-15 | First consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-03 | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1877 |