PA HB1884 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to release, upon the satisfaction of certain conditions, Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the West Rockhill - Sellersville Joint Recreation Authority, Bucks County; authorizing the conveyance of an easement and the release of Project 70 restrictions imposed on a portion of land owned by the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission in Gamble Township, Lycoming County, in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain land being conveyed to the commission in Gamble Township, Lycoming County, and other terms and conditions; authorizing the sale and transfer of title for Project 70 lands owned by Erie County to Springfield Township, Erie County; authorizing Westmoreland County to convey and transfer a fee interest in certain Project 70 land in Unity Township free of Project 70 restrictions in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other land in Unity Township to be acquired by Westmoreland County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to QRS Realty Corp. certain lands and building situate in the City of Erie, Erie County; and approving the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of Downingtown, Chester County, in return for the development of public park improvements within Kardon Park within the Borough of Downingtown and East Caln Township, Chester County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to release, upon the satisfaction of certain conditions, Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the West Rockhill - Sellersville Joint Recreation Authority, Bucks County; authorizing the conveyance of an easement and the release of Project 70 restrictions imposed on a portion of land owned by the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission in Gamble Township, Lycoming County, in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain land being conveyed to the commission in Gamble Township, Lycoming County, and other terms and conditions; authorizing the sale and transfer of title for Project 70 lands owned by Erie County to Springfield Township, Erie County; authorizing Westmoreland County to convey and transfer a fee interest in certain Project 70 land in Unity Township free of Project 70 restrictions in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other land in Unity Township to be acquired by Westmoreland County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to QRS Realty Corp. certain lands and building situate in the City of Erie, Erie County; and approving the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of Downingtown, Chester County, in return for the development of public park improvements within Kardon Park within the Borough of Downingtown and East Caln Township, Chester County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - HB 1884 PN 4224, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 1884 PN 4224, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-16 - House - HB 1884 PN 2450, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 1884 PN 4224, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-16 - House - HB 1884 PN 2450, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | House | Act No. 162 |
2012-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-1) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-17 | House | In the House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-11-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-11-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-11-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2011-11-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-11-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-11-15 | House | Second consideration |
2011-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-02 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-09-29 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |