PA HB1935 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on October 23 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Removed from table
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 5, 1941 (P.L.84, No.45), entitled "An act providing for and regulating the appointment, promotion and reduction in rank, suspension and removal of paid members of the police force in boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class maintaining a police force of not less than three members; creating a civil service commission in each borough, incorporated town and township of the first class; defining the duties of such civil service commission; imposing certain duties and expense on boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class; imposing penalties, and repealing inconsistent laws," further providing for removals, suspensions or reductions in rank of police officers.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 5, 1941 (P.L.84, No.45), entitled "An act providing for and regulating the appointment, promotion and reduction in rank, suspension and removal of paid members of the police force in boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class maintaining a police force of not less than three members; creating a civil service commission in each borough, incorporated town and township of the first class; defining the duties of such civil service commission; imposing certain duties and expense on boroughs, incorporated towns and townships of the first class; imposing penalties, and repealing inconsistent laws," further providing for removals, suspensions or reductions in rank of police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-24 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-24 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-26 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-05-07 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-07 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-06 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-06 | First consideration | |
2008-05-06 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-23 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1935 |