PA HB1993 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the reconstructed Gay Street Bridge on State Route 113, which crosses French Creek in the Borough of Phoenixville, Chester County, as the Veterans Memorial Gay Street Bridge.
Title
Designating the reconstructed Gay Street Bridge on State Route 113, which crosses French Creek in the Borough of Phoenixville, Chester County, as the Veterans Memorial Gay Street Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - HB 1993 PN 2693, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-03-08 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-08 | Second consideration | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-10-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-10-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-30 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-30 | First consideration | |
2009-09-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-22 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |