PA HB2018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the borough of Plymouth a permanent storm water drainage easement in Plymouth Borough, Luzerne County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the borough of Plymouth a permanent storm water drainage easement in Plymouth Borough, Luzerne County.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Mullery [D] | Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D] | Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Neal Goodman [D] | Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2018 PN 2834, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 2018 PN 2834, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 2018 PN 2834, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Act No. 49 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-02-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-22 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |