PA HB2036 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-15 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2008-05-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-05-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-03-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-03-11 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-10 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-10 | First consideration | |
2008-03-10 | Reported as amended | |
2007-11-15 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2036 |