PA HB2046 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for instructional certificate grade spans and age levels and duties of department.
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for instructional certificate grade spans and age levels and duties of department.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Rosita Youngblood [D] | Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Joseph Webster [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2046 PN 3121, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04455 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2046 PN 3121, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04455 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-02-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-03 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |