PA HB2082 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for blind veteran's pension and for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Title
In veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for blind veteran's pension and for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2082 PN 2951, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2082 PN 2951, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-02-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-03 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |