PA HB2176 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.
Title
In minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2176 PN 3082, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2176 PN 3082, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-01-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-21 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |