PA HB2233 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in liquid fuels and fuels tax, providing for political subdivision and volunteer service use of tax-free motor fuels and further providing for examination of records and equipment.
Title
In liquid fuels and fuels tax, providing for political subdivision and volunteer service use of tax-free motor fuels and further providing for examination of records and equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2233 PN 3276, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3276, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04662 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2233 PN 3276, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04662 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Act No. 129 |
2020-11-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Vote on third consideration reconsidered |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-04-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |