PA HB2386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Re-reported as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for business interruption insurance assistance and for powers and duties of the Department of Community and Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for business interruption insurance assistance and for powers and duties of the Department of Community and Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05887 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2386 PN 3602, CUTLER, MOT RECMT FINANCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05121 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-04-28HouseRe-committed to FINANCE (202-0)
2020-04-27HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-21HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-21HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-21HouseReported as amended
2020-04-06HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2386
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2386&pn=3529
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2386&pn=3602
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2386&pn=3858
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=04/21/2020&RollCallId=1799
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=04/21/2020&RollCallId=1800
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2084
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2085

Bill Comments

feedback