PA HB2436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |