PA HB2437 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for the prevention of child abuse and neglect.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for the prevention of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 2851, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 2851, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-23 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |