PA HB2549 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 1, 1988 (P.L.82, No.16), known as the Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority Act, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions and for financial assistance.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 1, 1988 (P.L.82, No.16), known as the Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority Act, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions and for financial assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-25 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2008-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-18 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-18 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-16 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-16 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-11 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-11 | First consideration | |
2008-06-11 | Reported as committed | |
2008-05-20 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2549 |