PA HB2673 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Allegheny Township, Blair County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Allegheny Township, Blair County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2673 PN 4098, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-06SenateSecond consideration
2020-10-05SenateFirst consideration
2020-10-05SenateReported as committed
2020-10-02SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-09-30SenateIn the Senate
2020-09-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-09-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-29HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-17HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-16HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-16HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-16HouseReported as committed
2020-07-08HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2673
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2673&pn=4098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/16/2020&RollCallId=2448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1641
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2560
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=10/05/2020&RollCallId=1204

Bill Comments

feedback