PA HB272 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for the title of the act, for definitions and for sexual assault evidence collection program; and providing for rights of sexual assault victims.
Title
Further providing for the title of the act, for definitions and for sexual assault evidence collection program; and providing for rights of sexual assault victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 272 PN 1202, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 272 PN 1202, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 272 PN 1048, 2015 A490, MARSICO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00382 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00382 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 272 PN 1202, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 272 PN 1048, 2015 A490, MARSICO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00382 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00382 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 27 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-04-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-03-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-03-31 | House | First consideration |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |