PA HB283 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 78-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1913 (P.L.155, No.104), referred to as the Separations Act, increasing the minimum bid requirement; and providing for evasion of requirements.
Title
Increasing the minimum bid requirement; and providing for evasion of requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-01-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-14 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-06 | House | Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2011-04-06 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2011-01-27 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |