PA HB33 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in planning agencies, further providing for appointment, term and vacancy of planning commission members and for conduct of business of planning commission.
Title
In planning agencies, further providing for appointment, term and vacancy of planning commission members and for conduct of business of planning commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 33 PN 355, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 355, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 355, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Act No. 42 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-07-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-03-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2015-03-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-04 | House | Second consideration |
2015-03-03 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-25 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |