PA HB333 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 199 PN 2654, PROCEED WITH BILL, HB 285 HB 333 - BENNINGHOFF (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03547 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 2656, FP (Y: 125 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 1160, 2021 A3401 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-01-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 199 PN 2654, PROCEED WITH BILL, HB 285 HB 333 - BENNINGHOFF (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03547 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 2656, FP (Y: 125 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 333 PN 1160, 2021 A3401 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-01-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2022-01-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (125-75) |
2022-01-25 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-01-25 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-24 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-11 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to FINANCE |