PA HB447 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 6, 1951 (P.L.69, No.20), known as The Landlord and Tenant Act of 1951, providing for death of a tenant.
Title
Providing for death of a tenant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 447 PN 1037, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 447 PN 1037, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 447 PN 1037, 2015 A448, SCHWEYER (Y: 83 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00412 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00412 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 447 PN 1037, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 447 PN 1037, 2015 A448, SCHWEYER (Y: 83 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00412 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00412 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-02 | Senate | Act No. 116 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-1) |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-14 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-03-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-03-31 | House | First consideration |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |