PA HB479 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, providing for delegation of functions necessary for the support of nursing services.
Title
Providing for delegation of functions necessary for the support of nursing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06387 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06387 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to HEALTH |