PA HB501 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the Conodoguinet Bridge on that portion of State Route 641 over the Conodoguinet Creek, Hopewell Township, Cumberland County, as the Army Pfc. Harold "Sam" E. Barrick Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge located on that portion of State Route 865, over the railroad tracks and Main Street in Bellwood, Blair County, as the Dominec M. "Patsy" Padula Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 940 over Tobyhanna Creek (Pocono Lake) in Tobyhanna Township, Monroe County, as the Sullivan Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 155 over the Allegheny River, Port Allegany Borough and Liberty Township, McKean County, as the Port Allegany Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Local Route T-325 over the Allegheny River, Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Lt. William E. Daisley, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the outlet of Lily Lake, Conyngham Township, Luzerne County, as the Senior Officer Eric J. Williams Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Greenwood Township, Clearfield County, as the 1st Lieutenant Wendell Elbert Ross Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3007 over the Redbank Creek, Summerville Borough, Jefferson County, as the Summerville Veterans Memorial Bridge; and renaming the bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 219 over U.S. Route 422 in Ebensburg Borough, Cambria County, as the Alexander Miller Abercrombie Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the Conodoguinet Bridge on that portion of State Route 641 over the Conodoguinet Creek, Hopewell Township, Cumberland County, as the Army Pfc. Harold "Sam" E. Barrick Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge located on that portion of State Route 865, over the railroad tracks and Main Street in Bellwood, Blair County, as the Dominec M. "Patsy" Padula Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 940 over Tobyhanna Creek (Pocono Lake) in Tobyhanna Township, Monroe County, as the Sullivan Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 155 over the Allegheny River, Port Allegany Borough and Liberty Township, McKean County, as the Port Allegany Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Local Route T-325 over the Allegheny River, Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Lt. William E. Daisley, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the outlet of Lily Lake, Conyngham Township, Luzerne County, as the Senior Officer Eric J. Williams Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 3005 over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Greenwood Township, Clearfield County, as the 1st Lieutenant Wendell Elbert Ross Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3007 over the Redbank Creek, Summerville Borough, Jefferson County, as the Summerville Veterans Memorial Bridge; and renaming the bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 219 over U.S. Route 422 in Ebensburg Borough, Cambria County, as the Alexander Miller Abercrombie Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 501 PN 2001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 501 PN 2001, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 501 PN 1319, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00593 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00593 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 501 PN 2001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 501 PN 2001, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 501 PN 1319, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00593 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00593 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Act No. 29 |
2015-07-10 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | In the House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-05-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-05-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-04 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |